This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 13:16:44 (UTC).

IMC 97-7 REFI CO. LLC v. JOSEPH PECYLAK JR. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 IMC 97-7 REFI CO LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOSEPH PECYLAK JR. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMC 97 7 REFI CO LLC

Defendants

Joseph Jr Pecylak

Darlene Pecylak

NORTHEASTERN MORTGAGE INVESTMENT CORP

DISCOVER BANK

John Doe and JANE DOE, said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclosed herein

AND JANE DOE SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS IT BEING THE INTENTION OF PLAINTIFF TO DESIGNATE ANY AND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raindorf, Ben Z

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP

MILLER, CHARLES W.

Attorney at PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLP

REYES, NATHANIA

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

NOTICE OF REJECTION

NOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Amended Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Amended Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Opposition to Verified Reply to Defendant, Joseph Pecylak's March 22, 2021 Answer to Foreclosure Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Opposition to Verified Reply to Defendant, Joseph Pecylak's March 22, 2021 Answer to Foreclosure Complaint; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

NOTICE OF REJECTION

NOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILITARY SEARCH: JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILITARY SEARCH: JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.; Filed By: Raindorf, B. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.; Filed By: Raindorf, B. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2021; Received: 03/22/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to the Complaint: Mortgage & Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to the Complaint: Mortgage & Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to the Complaint: Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to the Complaint: Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to the Complaint: Legal Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to the Complaint: Legal Description; Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. *Corrected*

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Amended Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Opposition to Verified Reply to Defendant, Joseph Pecylak's March 22, 2021 Answer to Foreclosure Complaint; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DARLENE PECYLAK; Filed By: Raindorf, B. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MILITARY SEARCH: JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.; Filed By: Raindorf, B. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOSEPH PECYLAK JR.; Filed By: Raindorf, B. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 03/24/2021; Received: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2021; Received: 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to the Complaint: Mortgage & Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to the Complaint: Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to the Complaint: Legal Description; Filed By: Miller, C.; Filed: 03/15/2021; Received: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. *Corrected*; Filed By: Raindorf, B.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less