This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:26:27 (UTC).

IBIS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC - v. - ARMIN'S CATERING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 IBIS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARMIN'S CATERING, LLC. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBIS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

Defendants

Armin Desch

ARMIN'S CATERING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, WILLIAM M

Attorney at STEIN & STEIN

Defendant Attorney

CARIDI, NINO JAMES

Attorney at NINO CARIDI LAW, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NOTICE Rescheduling notice

NOTICE Rescheduling notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaim

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaim; Filed By: Caridi, N.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference to Attorney

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference to Attorney; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) DANIEL LENCHNER

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) DANIEL LENCHNER; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Caridi, N.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin Desch

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin Desch; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin's Catering

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin's Catering; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Rescheduling notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Amended Answer with Counterclaim; Filed By: Caridi, N.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference to Attorney; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Payment History; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) DANIEL LENCHNER; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Caridi, N.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin Desch; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Armin's Catering; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less