This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 13:46:26 (UTC).

HUMBERTO QUINTAS ESPINA v. CARYL TELESFORD

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 HUMBERTO QUINTAS ESPINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CARYL TELESFORD. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren Baily-Schiffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Loren Baily-Schiffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Humberto Quintas Espina

Defendant

Caryl Telesford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND, BETH MICHELLE

Attorney at WILLIAM SCHWITZER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

ROUSSEAU, MARC A

Attorney at Robert A. Peirce & Associates

SALVATO, RICHARD ANTHONY

Attorney at ROBERT A. PEIRCE & ASSOCIATES

ROUSSEAU, MARC ANTHONY

Attorney at Robert A. Peirce & Associates

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Second Good Faith Letter dated 3.31.20

EXHIBIT(S) - D Second Good Faith Letter dated 3.31.20; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order dated 2.5.20

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order dated 2.5.20; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Plaintiff's Good Faith Letter dated 10.1.19

EXHIBIT(S) - B Plaintiff's Good Faith Letter dated 10.1.19; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiff's Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiff's Demands; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 02/05/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 02/05/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars and Discovery Demands and Notices

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars and Discovery Demands and Notices; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Second Good Faith Letter dated 3.31.20; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Order dated 2.5.20; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Plaintiff's Good Faith Letter dated 10.1.19; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiff's Demands; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/06/2020; Received: 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 02/05/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 1/6/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars and Discovery Demands and Notices; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Salvato, R.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less