This case was last updated from Warren County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 13:44:00 (UTC).

HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Fremont Home Loan Trust 2005-C, Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-C v. Raymond Steele et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Fremont Home Loan Trust 2005-C, Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Raymond Steele. This case was filed in Warren County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8796

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Warren, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA NA

Defendants

Raymond Steele a/k/a Ray Steele

Maria angelica Steele

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

John Doe #1-#12 FICTITIOUS et al.

Ray Steele

FREMONT INVESTMENT & LOAN

MERS AS NOMINEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOSATO, MELISSA A.

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE raymond 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE raymond 3215; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/13/2021; Received: 04/13/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE 3215 MAIL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE 3215 MAIL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2021; Received: 04/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE maria mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE maria mail; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND STEELE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND STEELE; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE credit acceptance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE credit acceptance; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE mortgage electronic

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE mortgage electronic; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E Vacancy Registration

EXHIBIT(S) - E Vacancy Registration; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Demand Letters

EXHIBIT(S) - D Demand Letters; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Lienors

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Lienors; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage and Assignment of Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage and Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE raymond 3215; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/13/2021; Received: 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE 3215 MAIL; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2021; Received: 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE maria mail; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARIA STEELE; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND STEELE; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2021; Received: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE credit acceptance; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/29/2021; Received: 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE mortgage electronic; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Vacancy Registration; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Demand Letters; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Lienors; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage and Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less