Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 03:04:47 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA, N.A. v. PARATY, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 HSBC BANK USA, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PARATY, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA, N.A.

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

John Doe

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE LEONARD CONDOMINIUM

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Adriano C. Piccinin AKA ADRIANO CARNEIRO PICCININ, AKA ADRIANO PICCININ

PARATY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SZCZYGIEL, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

JUREK, AMBER AUGUSTINE

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

 

Court Documents

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC DEPT OF FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC DEPT OF FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC C/O KENNETH THOMAS, ESQ - 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC C/O KENNETH THOMAS, ESQ - 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC DEPT OF FINANCE; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC C/O KENNETH THOMAS, ESQ - 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARATY LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less