Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 14:13:28 (UTC).

HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Arnold Quismorio Bengco et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 HSBC Bank USA, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Arnold Quismorio Bengco. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC Bank USA, N.A.

Defendants

Board of Managers of The 322 West 57th Street Condominium

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10, the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described i

Arnold Quismorio Bengco a/k/a Arnold Bengco

Rachelle Bengco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

Defendant Attorney

BELTRANI, MARIA I

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SLADKUS REICH GREENBERG ATLAS LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE 322 WEST 57TH STREET CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE 322 WEST 57TH STREET CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Beltrani, M.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARNOLD QUISMORIO BENGCO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARNOLD QUISMORIO BENGCO; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RACHELLE BENGCO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RACHELLE BENGCO; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT NonMilitary Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT NonMilitary Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE 322 WEST 57TH STREET CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Beltrani, M.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ARNOLD QUISMORIO BENGCO; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RACHELLE BENGCO; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NonMilitary Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less