This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:12:37 (UTC).

HSBC BANK, USA NA. - v. - ABRAMINO HABER et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 HSBC BANK, USA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ABRAMINO HABER. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK, USA NA.

Defendants

JANE DOE

JOHN DOE

Abraham Haber

Sarina Haber

Abramino Haber

CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASE, DAVID P

Attorney at RELIN, GOLDSTEIN & CRANE, L.L.P.

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY SUCCESSIVE NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY SUCCESSIVE NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY SUCCESSIVE NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less