This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:25:24 (UTC).

HOWARD KATES v. ROCHELLE BAER

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 HOWARD KATES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROCHELLE BAER. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Kates

Defendant

Rochelle Baer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDRUZZI, JOSEPH C

Attorney at JOSEPH C. ANDRUZZI, ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KATZ, JOHN DAVID

Attorney at Shearer PC

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST 2021---10.12---Req.PC.withAffGoodFaith

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST 2021---10.12---Req.PC.withAffGoodFaith; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---MedicalDisclos(AZs) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---MedicalDisclos(AZs) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCellPhoneRecDemand

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCellPhoneRecDemand; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---Plaintiff..ESI..Demands

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---Plaintiff..ESI..Demands; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCPLR3121HospitalRecCopyDem

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCPLR3121HospitalRecCopyDem; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffDemandforCopiesofDocsbyNonPartySubpoena

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffDemandforCopiesofDocsbyNonPartySubpoena; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---SuppDemand(DocsRE.AffirmativeDefenses)

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---SuppDemand(DocsRE.AffirmativeDefenses); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---CombDemands

DEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---CombDemands; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(billing))

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(billing)); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(MedRec))

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(MedRec)); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 2021---09.16---AfdofService

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 2021---09.16---AfdofService; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 09/28/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---09.07---PlaintiffDisclos(MiscSpecialDamagesDocs)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---09.07---PlaintiffDisclos(MiscSpecialDamagesDocs); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 2021---08.02---SummonsandVerifiedComplaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 2021---08.02---SummonsandVerifiedComplaint; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST 2021---10.12---Req.PC.withAffGoodFaith; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---MedicalDisclos(AZs) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCellPhoneRecDemand; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---Plaintiff..ESI..Demands; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffCPLR3121HospitalRecCopyDem; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---PlaintiffDemandforCopiesofDocsbyNonPartySubpoena; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---SuppDemand(DocsRE.AffirmativeDefenses); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 2021---10.12---CombDemands; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(billing)); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---10.12---NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(StFrancisHospital(MedRec)); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 2021---09.16---AfdofService; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 09/28/2021; Received: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND 2021---09.07---PlaintiffDisclos(MiscSpecialDamagesDocs); Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 09/07/2021; Received: 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 2021---08.02---SummonsandVerifiedComplaint; Filed By: Andruzzi, J.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less