Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:34:35 (UTC).

Hong Yu - v. - Thomas R Melucci et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Hong Yu filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thomas R Melucci. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hong Yu

Defendants

EAST HILLS CHRYSLER-PLYMOUTH INC

Thomas R Melucci

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, FRANK

Attorney at LITE & RUSSELL, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

TEUBNER, GARY ALFRED

Attorney at Gannon, Rosenfarb & Drossman

SCHAUB, KURT ANDREW

Attorney at GENTILE & TAMBASCO

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Teubner, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Adj'd to 2-19-19

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Adj'd to 2-19-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Teubner, G.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

ANSWER (AMENDED) With Crossclaim

ANSWER (AMENDED) With Crossclaim; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION Stipulation Amending Caption

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION Stipulation Amending Caption; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Resch March Ctrl Date to 3/7/18

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Resch March Ctrl Date to 3/7/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCOVERY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Teubner, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Adj'd to 2-19-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Teubner, G.; Filed: 04/02/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) With Crossclaim; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION Stipulation Amending Caption; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Resch March Ctrl Date to 3/7/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Schaub, K. - filed by Camerino, N.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Russell, F.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less