This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 19:06:16 (UTC).

HOMEBRIDGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. SHAUNA TRUNZO et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 HOMEBRIDGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHAUNA TRUNZO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Onofry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Onofry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMEBRIDGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(SOUTHERN DISTRICT)

M T BY AND THROUGH HIS NATURAL GUARDIAN SHAUNA TRUNZO AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D. TRUNZO

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Shauna Trunzo AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D. TRUNZO

A T BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN SHAUNA TRUNZO AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D. TRUNZO

S T BY AND THROUGH HER NATURAL GUARDIAN SHAUNA TRUNZO AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D. TRUNZO

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #20, the last twenty names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premi

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D. TRUNZO, if living and if they be dead, any and all persons who may claim and devisees, distributees, legal representatives, successors and interest of the said defendants, all of whom and whose names and

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CONFUSIONE, LISA M

Attorney at STAGG, TERENZI, CONFUSIONE & WABNIK, LLP

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #2) *substitute referee; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER *referred to Court Attorney Referee-questions should be directed to John Lindstrom, Esq. 845-762-5917; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #2) NOA; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #2) GUARDIAN AD LITEM DOCUMENTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 316; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #2) DEATH CERTIFICATE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Zebrowski, K.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Confusione, L. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Confusione, L.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less