This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:31:55 (UTC).

High Speed Capital LLC v. Synergy Fit Team LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 High Speed Capital LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Synergy Fit Team LLC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

High Speed Capital LLC

Defendants

SYNERGY FITNESS

Bobby Florio

Synergy Fit Team LLC d/b/a Synergy Fitness

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEREBRO, VADIM

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less