This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:04:16 (UTC).

HENRY LONG v. TEJINDER KAUSHAL et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 HENRY LONG filed an Other lawsuit against TEJINDER KAUSHAL. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Long

Defendants

Tejinder Kaushal

Kisha Sylvester

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorneys

MEISEL, JUDY RACHEL

Attorney at Sobel Pevzner, LLC

PEVZNER, BELLA

Attorney at SOBEL PEVZNER, LLC

GOLDMAN, DAVID M.

Attorney at SOBEL PEVZNER, LLC

 

Court Documents

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference & Affirmation of Good Faith

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference & Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED OCTOBER 29, 2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED OCTOBER 29, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 01/07/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 01/07/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pevzner, B.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pevzner, B.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 01/07/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED OCTOBER 29, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference & Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Meisel, J.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pevzner, B.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pevzner, B.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less