This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 12:46:17 (UTC).

Heidi L Henderson et al - v. - Dean Street Development LLC

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 Heidi L Henderson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dean Street Development LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francisco A Smith

Heidi L Henderson

Defendant and Petitioner

Dean Street Development LLC

Respondent

ALJ CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TARNOK, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at D'AGOSTINO, LEVINE, LANDESMAN, LEDERMAN, RIVERA & SAMPSON LLP

Petitioner Attorney

OLIVIA M GROSS (NB 22063)

Defendant Attorney

GROSS, OLIVIA M

Attorney at Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.

Respondent Attorney

Peter S Read (40318.00193)

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Affirmation in Opposition

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Affirmation in Opposition

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) NOVEMBER 2, 2017 CORRESPONDENCE TO ALL PARTIES

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) NOVEMBER 2, 2017 CORRESPONDENCE TO ALL PARTIES; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DEMANDS

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Counterclaims

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Counterclaims; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Verified Complaint (Defendant's Deed)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Verified Complaint (Defendant's Deed); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Verified Complaint (Plaintiffs' Deed)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Verified Complaint (Plaintiffs' Deed); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) NOVEMBER 2, 2017 CORRESPONDENCE TO ALL PARTIES; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS AND VERIFIED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Read, P.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third-Party Summons and Verified Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Counterclaims; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation to Cancel Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Verified Complaint (Defendant's Deed); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Verified Complaint (Plaintiffs' Deed); Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Tarnok, C.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less