Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:18:40 (UTC).

HEATHER NOBLE - v. - FRANK L. FINI et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 HEATHER NOBLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANK L FINI. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine Slobod. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Elaine Slobod

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Noble

Defendants

FDF ENTERPRISES, INC.

Frank L. Fini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE-HATCHARD, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen J. Cole-Hatchard

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorneys

BANNON, JAMES RYAN

Attorney at The Law Offices of Craig P. Curcio

SMITH, KIRBY JERMAINE

Attorney at The Law Offices of Craig P. Curcio

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Bannon, J.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply to plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition and in further support of defendants' ... show more

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply to plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition and in further support of defendants' ... show more; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical reports from Dft Ex

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical reports from Dft Ex; Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical expert report

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical expert report; Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney Verification

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney Verification; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Frank L. Fini

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Frank L. Fini; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on FDF Enterprises, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on FDF Enterprises, Inc.; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Bannon, J.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Decision & Order; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply to plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition and in further support of defendants' motion seeking summary judgment.; Filed By: Smith, K.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical reports from Dft Ex; Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's medical expert report; Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/02/2018; Received: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney Verification; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Rispin, C.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Frank L. Fini; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on FDF Enterprises, Inc.; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less