Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:11:30 (UTC).

HD Development of MD, Inc. - v. - City of Albany

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 HD Development of MD, Inc filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against City of Albany. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HD Development of MD, Inc.

Defendant

City of Albany

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAVITSKY, BRUCE J

Attorney at STAVITSKY & ASSOCIATES LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - AMENDED ENTERED BY CLERK

ORDER - AMENDED ENTERED BY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

ORDER - OTHER order and judgment-entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER order and judgment-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Personal Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Personal Service; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition

RJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION Petition

PETITION Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED ENTERED BY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER order and judgment-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Personal Service; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less