This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:00:01 (UTC).

H. D. v. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 H D filed an Other lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna Mills. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donna Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H. D. an infant under the age of 18, by his mother and natural guardian, ANA PULGARIN

Defendants

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELLA MURA, PETER

Attorney at DELLA MURA & CIACCI LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Guardian Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Guardian Affidavit; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

NOTICE Status Conference 9/4/19

NOTICE Status Conference 9/4/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Physician's Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE DATED 10/29/2019

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE DATED 10/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED)

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE DATED 10/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Status Conference 9/4/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Guardian Affidavit; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Della Mura, P.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less