This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 14:54:26 (UTC).

GUTHRIE MEDICAL GROUP PC v. LOIS RICH

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 GUTHRIE MEDICAL GROUP PC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOIS RICH. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTHRIE MEDICAL GROUP PC

Defendant

Lois Rich

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMMOND, CHAD RICHARD

Attorney at Chad R. Hammond, Esq.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 DEPT OF DEFENSE STATUS REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 DEPT OF DEFENSE STATUS REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 DEPT OF DEFENSE STATUS REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED; Filed By: Hammond, C.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less