Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 01:59:08 (UTC).

Griffith Institute Employees Federal Credit Union - v. - Jennifer Logan

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Griffith Institute Employees Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Logan. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Griffith Institute Employees Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Jennifer Logan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S)

affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S)

information subpoena

AFFIRMATION

attorney's affirmation

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 18, 2018

EXHIBIT(S)

Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S)

aos

EXHIBIT(S)

s&c

EXHIBIT(S)

attorney fee provision

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) information subpoena; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #002) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 18, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #001) aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #001) s&c Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) attorney fee provision Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/05/2018; Received: 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less