This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 12:58:01 (UTC).

Gregory Minor et al v. Anthony Annucci et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Gregory Minor filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Anthony Annucci. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Caruso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank Caruso

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory Minor

Aaron Gray

Anwar Cohen

Michael Ramos

Abdul Arrahim

Sereka Green

Cory Cox

Jerome Wingfield

Donald Smith

Lee Gates

Lenny Carpenter

Gilbert Cruz

David Williams JR

Jkendric Agee

Nathaniel Smith

Derrell Austin

Anthony Scarfone

James Ashley

Ricky Caldwell

Alexis Cruz

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATALANO, A. JOSEPH

Other Attorneys

FEELEY, MICHAEL THOMAS

 

Court Documents

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

RJI -RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

RJI -RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2022; Received: 03/14/2022

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2022; Received: 03/14/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 03/28/2022; Received: 03/28/2022

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 03/31/2022; Received: 03/31/2022

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 05/09/2022; Received: 05/09/2022

 

Docket Entries

05/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 05/09/2022; Received: 05/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 03/31/2022; Received: 03/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY; Filed By: Feeley, M.; Filed: 03/28/2022; Received: 03/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2022; Received: 03/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2022; Received: 03/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION; Filed By: Catalano, A.; Filed: 03/09/2022; Received: 03/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less