This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:04:22 (UTC).

Greg Gallagher - v. - Smart Science Education Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Greg Gallagher filed an Other lawsuit against Smart Science Education Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greg Gallagher

Defendant

Smart Science Education Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abrams, David Nehemiah

Attorney at David Abrams, Attorney at Law

Defendant Attorneys

KIMMEL, JEFFREY A.

Attorney at Akerman LLP

RUTIGLIANO, PAUL JOSEPH

Attorney at Akerman LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Rutigliano, P.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses

ANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Rutigliano, P.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Rutigliano, P.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 07/03/2018; Received: 07/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Rutigliano, P.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Kimmel, J.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Abrams, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less