This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 14:25:52 (UTC).

Green Capital Funding LLC v. Miguel A Valle et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Green Capital Funding LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Miguel A Valle. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Capital Funding LLC

Defendants

Texas Construction And Glass

Miguel A Valle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEREBRO, VADIM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less