This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 03:27:54 (UTC).

Green Capital Funding LLC v. Markantonis Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Green Capital Funding LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Markantonis Group Inc. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Capital Funding LLC

Defendants

Markantonis Group Inc

ESTIA

Catherine Markantonis

Nicholas S Markantonis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRO, CHRISTOPHER ROBERT

Attorney at MCA Recovery LLC

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Castro, C.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less