Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 16:14:51 (UTC).

Green Capital Funding, LLC v. Jesse W Degarmo et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Green Capital Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jesse W Degarmo. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Capital Funding, LLC

Defendants

JW DEGARMO TRUCKING

Jesse W Degarmo

OVER THE ROAD TRUCK HAULING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEREBRO, VADIM

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction Of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Judgment By Confession; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Serebro, V.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less