Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 15:50:15 (UTC).

GREATER NIAGARA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. MICHAEL COLEMAN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 GREATER NIAGARA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL COLEMAN. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREATER NIAGARA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Michael Coleman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less