Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 15:08:38 (UTC).

GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O ALEXANDRA BROWN - v. - K-W 650 ASSOCIATES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O ALEXANDRA BROWN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against K-W 650 ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O ALEXANDRA BROWN

Defendants

KUMKANG HOUSING NY LLC

K-W 650 ASSOCIATES LLC

IBEX CONSTRACTING INC.

KUMKANG HOUSING CO., LTD.

GOLDSTEIN ASSOCIATES CONSULTING ENGINEERS, PLLC

LIVEIN INC.

IBEX DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION CORP

IBEX CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC

WESTPORT GROUP, INC.

WESTPORT 650 COMPANY, LLC

KEUMKANG HOUSING CO. LTD.

WESTPORT 650 LLC

IBEX CONSTRUCTION U.S., LLC

Klaus Kretschmann

Keun-hwan Bae

IBEX CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC

IBEX DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION CO., LLC

IBEX CONSTRUCTION, LLC

KUMKANG 650 MANAGER CORP.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TUMBLESON, PAUL A

Attorney at EUSTACE, MARQUEZ, ESPTEIN, PREZIOSO & YAPCHANYK

DEMARZO, TERENCE HENRY

Attorney at Eustace, Marquez, Epstein, Prezioso & Yapchanyk

Defendant Attorneys

LEVITT, ANDREW C

Attorney at O'HARE PARNAGIAN LLP

LICHTMAN, JEFFREY STUART

Attorney at O'HARE PARNAGIAN LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Demarzo, T.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 11/26/2018; Received: 11/26/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang Housing Co Ltd

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang Housing Co Ltd; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang 650 Manager Corp

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang 650 Manager Corp; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers PLLC

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers PLLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- K-W 650 Associates LLC

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- K-W 650 Associates LLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Development Construction Corp

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Development Construction Corp; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Contracting Inc

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Contracting Inc; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Construction LLC.

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Construction LLC.; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service- IBEX Construction U S LLC

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service- IBEX Construction U S LLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Demarzo, T.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 11/26/2018; Received: 11/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice and copy of check for stenographer's fee; Filed By: Lichtman, J.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Construction Services Inc; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang Housing Co Ltd; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Kumkang 650 Manager Corp; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers PLLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- K-W 650 Associates LLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Development Construction Corp; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Contracting Inc; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit- IBEX Construction LLC.; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service- IBEX Construction U S LLC; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumbleson, P.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less