Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:48:11 (UTC).

Goldstein Robyn - v. - The New York and Presbyterian Hospital et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 Goldstein Robyn filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A Madden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joan A Madden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldstein Robyn by SAUL GOLDSTEIN, Curator Ad Personam and Curator Bonis (Guardian of the Person and the Property) of ROBYN GOLDSTEIN, Pursuant to the High Court of South Africa

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Rohan Ramakrishna M.D.

Aaron Gusdon M.D.

Linda Anne Heier M.D.

The New York and Presbyterian Hospital

Ibrahim Hussain M.D.

Justin Schwarz M.D.

Alexandra Tatum-hannan M.D.

Theodore H. Schwartz M.D.

Ajay Gupta M.D.

J. Levi Chazen M.D.

Sarah Kenworthy R.N.

New York-Presbyterian/Weill Cornell Medical Center

Neal S. Parikh M.D.

Babak Navi M.D.

Robert David Zimmerman M.D.

Obaid Ahmad Sagher P.A.

Gloria C. Chiang M.D.

Dana Leifer M.D.

The New York and Presbyterian Hospital (s/h/a The New York and Presbyterian, New York-Presbyterian/Weill Cornell Medical Center

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AARON, MITCHELL KEITH

Attorney at TORGAN COOPER & AARON, P.C.

HENDERSON, IAN SULLY

Attorney at Torgan Cooper & Aaron

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

RAPPAPORT, JAY ALLEN

Attorney at AARONSON RAPPAPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH

DENARO, KEVIN

Attorney at Aaronson Rappaport Feinstein & Deutsch

TERJANIAN, NANOR LAURY

Attorney at Aaronson Rappaport Feinstein & Deutsch, LLP

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ANSWER INDIVIDUAL VERIFICATION to ANSWER served on behalf of defendant DANA LEIFER, M.D.

ANSWER INDIVIDUAL VERIFICATION to ANSWER served on behalf of defendant DANA LEIFER, M.D.; Filed By: Denaro, K.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

APPENDIX Verification to the Answer interposed on behalf of Rohan Ramakrishna MD

APPENDIX Verification to the Answer interposed on behalf of Rohan Ramakrishna MD; Filed By: Terjanian, N.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (15)

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (15); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (1)

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (1); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Amended E-Filing Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - C Amended E-Filing Notice; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Electronic Filing (revised)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Electronic Filing (revised); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER INDIVIDUAL VERIFICATION to ANSWER served on behalf of defendant DANA LEIFER, M.D.; Filed By: Denaro, K.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX Verification to the Answer interposed on behalf of Rohan Ramakrishna MD; Filed By: Terjanian, N.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice with Pleadings; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (15); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service (1); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Amended E-Filing Notice; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Electronic Filing (revised); Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice; Filed By: Aaron, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less