This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:43:51 (UTC).

GLOBAL LIBERTY INSURANCE CO. - v. - HACKENSACK SURGERY CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 GLOBAL LIBERTY INSURANCE CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HACKENSACK SURGERY CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLOBAL LIBERTY INSURANCE CO.

Defendant

HACKENSACK SURGERY CENTER, LLC a/a/o GELITZA RODRIGUEZ-MILAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TENENBAUM, JASON

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JASON TENENBAUM, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSARIO, JOHN JOHN AGERICO BAUTISTA

Attorney at JOHN ROSARIO ESQ.

ROSARIO, JOHN JOSHUA BABAO

Attorney at ROSALES DEL ROSARIO PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Stipulation of discontinuance

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

Request for Preliminary Conference

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Affidavit of Service enclosed in file

EXHIBIT(S)

Copy of affidavit

EXHIBIT(S)

Copy of bills, denial and peer review

EXHIBIT(S)

Copy of Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Copy of Summons + Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

PROOF OF SERVICE

Regisered Mailing Return Reciept for Hackensack Surgery Center

AFFIDAVIT

DOS and Registered mailing affidavits for Hackensack Surgery Center, LLC

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of discontinuance; Filed By: Rosario, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Rosario, J.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Rosario, J.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: pc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Rosario, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service enclosed in file; Filed By: Rosario, J.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) copy of demand for master arbitral review; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Copy of affidavit; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Copy of bills, denial and peer review; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Copy of Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Copy of Summons + Complaint; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Regisered Mailing Return Reciept for Hackensack Surgery Center; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DOS and Registered mailing affidavits for Hackensack Surgery Center, LLC; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tenenbaum, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less