Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 20:57:44 (UTC).

Giora Neeman et al - v. - Town of Warwick et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 Giora Neeman filed an Other lawsuit against Town of Warwick. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Giora Neeman, LLC

Giora Neeman

Defendants

Town of Warwick

the Rita P. Smith Living Trust

Town of Warwick Town Board

Rita Zelda smith

Black Bear Family Campground, Inc.

Town of Warwick Zoning Board of Appeals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKAY, JOSEPH G

Attorney at Catania Mahon Milligram & Rider, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

MYROW, JAY R.

Attorney at BLUSTEIN, SHAPIRO, RICH & BARONE, LLP

KLEISTER, CHRISTOPHER B

Attorney at The Kleister Law Group

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION 14-0085

STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION 14-0085; Filed By: Myrow, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr to Judge re extend return date of petition 10-27-17

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr to Judge re extend return date of petition 10-27-17; Filed By: Myrow, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A 1980 site plan

EXHIBIT(S) - A 1980 site plan; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of John Conrad

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of John Conrad; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos depicting slope

EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos depicting slope; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Developers Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C Developers Agreement; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Judge Slobod Decision dated June 9, 2009

EXHIBIT(S) - B Judge Slobod Decision dated June 9, 2009; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Town of Warwick Board of Appeals Decision

EXHIBIT(S) - A Town of Warwick Board of Appeals Decision; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

COMPLAINT Verified Petition and Complaint

COMPLAINT Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION 14-0085; Filed By: Myrow, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr to Judge re extend return date of petition 10-27-17; Filed By: Myrow, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A 1980 site plan; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of John Conrad; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Photos depicting slope; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verufication page; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kleister, C.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Developers Agreement; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Judge Slobod Decision dated June 9, 2009; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Town of Warwick Board of Appeals Decision; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Mckay, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less