This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:38:24 (UTC).

GINA FONTAINE - v. - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 GINA FONTAINE filed an Other lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gina Fontaine

Defendants

John Doe #1

MTA & MTA BUS COMPANY

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Jane Doe #1

John Doe #2

Jane Doe #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, DAVID J.

Attorney at David J. Hernandez & Associates

Defendant Attorney

ZENTZ, MICHAEL THOMAS

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified S&C

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified S&C Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Zentz, M.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hernandez, D.; Filed: 11/18/2017; Received: 11/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Zentz, M.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified S&C Filed By: Hamboussi, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less