This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 14:37:19 (UTC).

GHS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. JASON HILL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 GHS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JASON HILL. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****-371

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

Jason Hill AKA THOMAS JASON HILL

Thomas jason Aka Hill

Thomas jason Hill Aka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS, PAUL L

Attorney at PAUL L. MARKS

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit

AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT non military affidavit; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Mailing of a copy of the summons and complaint; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment-Default; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marks, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less