This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 11/04/2022 at 17:59:17 (UTC).

George Garvey et al v. City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 George Garvey filed an Other lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph Porzio. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2022

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ralph Porzio

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Garvey

Adam Bianco

Anthony Figueroa

Curtis Cutler

Dale Nicholls

Danny Hulkower

Frank Calamanco

James Germano

Kola Smith

Mandel Bailey

Mitchum Greene

Patricia Buccellato

Ralph Martinez

Russell Piazza

Sean Abel

Tommy Libretti

Defendants

City of New York

New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene

New York City Department of Sanitation

David Chokshi in his official capacity as the commissioner of the department of health and mental hygiene

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVEGLIA, CHAD JACKSON

Defendant Attorneys

O'CONNOR, ANDREA MARY

HOLMES, DAVID VICTOR

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #003)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2022; Received: 10/28/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Contempt

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Contempt; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/27/2022; Received: 10/27/2022

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Contempt

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Contempt; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/27/2022; Received: 10/27/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/26/2022; Received: 10/26/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/26/2022; Received: 10/26/2022

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Holmes, D.; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/25/2022

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Letter

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Letter; Filed By: Holmes, D.; Filed: 10/24/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Employment Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Employment Contract; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Statement by Council Speaker Adrienne E. Adams

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Statement by Council Speaker Adrienne E. Adams; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Mayor Adams' March 2022 EO

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Mayor Adams' March 2022 EO; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 December Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 December Order; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 October Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 October Order; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Petitioners' Affidavits

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Petitioners' Affidavits; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2022; Received: 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) Contempt; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/27/2022; Received: 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Contempt; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/27/2022; Received: 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/26/2022; Received: 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 10/26/2022; Received: 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Holmes, D.; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Letter; Filed By: Holmes, D.; Filed: 10/24/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Employment Contract; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Statement by Council Speaker Adrienne E. Adams; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Mayor Adams' March 2022 EO; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 December Order; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 October Order; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Petitioners' Affidavits; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Laveglia, C.; Filed: 07/20/2022; Received: 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less