This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:40:48 (UTC).

GENESEE REGIONAL BANK - v. - PANE VITA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 GENESEE REGIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PANE VITA, LLC. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1001

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENESEE REGIONAL BANK

Defendants

KEYBANK N.A.

US INCOME PARTNERS LLC

W. Randolph Warner

10 WHITE STREET, LLC

PANE VITA, LLC

J. ANTHONY FOODS, LLC

CT FINANCIAL RESOURCES, LLC

BONA VIA, INC.

Joseph A. Lisi

STONEHENGE CAPITAL FUND OF NEW YORK, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEGMAN, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at LACY KATZEN LLP

Defendant Attorney

JAFFE, CHAIM J

Attorney at SCOLARO, SHULMAN, COHEN, FETTER & BURSTEIN, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - Y Mortgage on 10 White Street, Rochester, New York dated and recorded on May 18, 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - Y Mortgage on 10 White Street, Rochester, New York dated and recorded on May 18, 2017; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - X May 16, 2017 notice in respect to $400,000 obligation

EXHIBIT(S) - X May 16, 2017 notice in respect to $400,000 obligation; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - W May 16, 2017 notice of default and demand for payment

EXHIBIT(S) - W May 16, 2017 notice of default and demand for payment; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - V September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest

EXHIBIT(S) - V September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - U June 29 and September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest

EXHIBIT(S) - U June 29 and September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - T June 23, 2015 PV purchase money security interest

EXHIBIT(S) - T June 23, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - S June 16, 2015 PV purchase money security interest

EXHIBIT(S) - S June 16, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - R May 29, 2015 PV purchase money security interest

EXHIBIT(S) - R May 29, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - H March 27, 2015 JAF general security agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - H March 27, 2015 JAF general security agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G March 27, 2015 Lisi absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee

EXHIBIT(S) - G March 27, 2015 Lisi absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F March 27, 2015 JAF absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee

EXHIBIT(S) - F March 27, 2015 JAF absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E March 27, 2015 mortgage and security agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - E March 27, 2015 mortgage and security agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D March 27, 2015 demand line of credit note

EXHIBIT(S) - D March 27, 2015 demand line of credit note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C March 27, 2015 Loan Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - C March 27, 2015 Loan Agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B June 11, 2015 PV promissory note

EXHIBIT(S) - B June 11, 2015 PV promissory note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A May 29, 2015 PV promissory note

EXHIBIT(S) - A May 29, 2015 PV promissory note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Y Mortgage on 10 White Street, Rochester, New York dated and recorded on May 18, 2017; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - X May 16, 2017 notice in respect to $400,000 obligation; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - W May 16, 2017 notice of default and demand for payment; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - V September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - U June 29 and September 9, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - T June 23, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - S June 16, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R May 29, 2015 PV purchase money security interest; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q May 29 and June 11, 2015 JAF general security agreements; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I March 27, 2015 10 WS general security agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H March 27, 2015 JAF general security agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G March 27, 2015 Lisi absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F March 27, 2015 JAF absolute, unlimited and continuing guarantee; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E March 27, 2015 mortgage and security agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D March 27, 2015 demand line of credit note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C March 27, 2015 Loan Agreement; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B June 11, 2015 PV promissory note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A May 29, 2015 PV promissory note; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wegman, M.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less