This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:56:28 (UTC).

GENERATIONS ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC v. SUNRISE COVE ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 GENERATIONS ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SUNRISE COVE ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1185

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENERATIONS ASSET MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

SUNRISE COVE ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COPE, KEVIN GEORGE

MILLER, ANDREW OLSON

Defendant Attorney

O'NEILL, STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #5)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #5); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex C - Declaration Sec. 6.01

EXHIBIT(S) - C Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex C - Declaration Sec. 6.01; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex B - Lundine Easement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex B - Lundine Easement; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex A - Geleil Easement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex A - Geleil Easement; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Patrick Duffey dated July, 7, 2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Patrick Duffey dated July, 7, 2017; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5) for Summary Judgment (Dismiss Complaint and Other Relief)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5) for Summary Judgment (Dismiss Complaint and Other Relief); Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. E - Sullivans Deed (Lot 34) to Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. E - Sullivans Deed (Lot 34) to Plaintiff; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. D - Developer Deed (Lot 34) to Sullivans

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. D - Developer Deed (Lot 34) to Sullivans; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Defendants' Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) GAMG Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) GAMG Amended Complaint; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4) Affirmation of Andrew O. Miller, Esq.

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4) Affirmation of Andrew O. Miller, Esq.; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Defendants Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc. and The Board of Directors for The Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Defendants Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc. and The Board of Directors for The Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc.; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #5); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex C - Declaration Sec. 6.01; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex B - Lundine Easement; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Duffey Affid (7.7.17) Ex A - Geleil Easement; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Patrick Duffey dated July, 7, 2017; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5) for Summary Judgment (Dismiss Complaint and Other Relief); Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. E - Sullivans Deed (Lot 34) to Plaintiff; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. D - Developer Deed (Lot 34) to Sullivans; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) ONeill Affirm Ex. C - NYS Certification Subdivision Plans; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Email dated June 15, 2017; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) GAMG Amended Complaint; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4) Affirmation of Andrew O. Miller, Esq.; Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Defendants Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc. and The Board of Directors for The Sunrise Cove Assoc., Inc.; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4); Filed By: Miller, A.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less