This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 12:34:50 (UTC).

Gemcap Equity Corp. et al v. Jacob Hersh Zicherman et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 Gemcap Equity Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jacob Hersh Zicherman. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Sylvia G. Ash, Comm 11. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Sylvia G. Ash, Comm 11

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

652 Grandview Ave LLC

118 Kingsland LLC

340 Clifton Place LLC

2028 Grove LLC

250 Schafer LLC

7106 Fresh Pond LLC

Gemcap Equity Corp. individually and on behalf of

2164A Fulton LLC

Charnie Zicherman a/k/a Charny Zicherman

Jacob Hersh Zicherman

John Does '1' through '10'

250 Schafer LLC a/k/a 250 Schaefer LLC

Not Yet Classified

Ice Lender Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEWMAN, EVAN M

Attorney at Jacobowitz Newman Tversky LLP

BEINHORN, ABRAHAM S.

Attorney at Jacobowitz Newman Tversky LLP

Defendant Attorney

ROSENFELD, AVINOAM YACKOV

Attorney at The Rosenfeld Law Office

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KITTREDGE, DAVID N

Attorney at LaROCCA HORNIK ROSEN GREENBERG BLAHA LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #2)

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Partial Cancellation LP -340 Clifton Place Brooklyn NY

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Partial Cancellation LP -340 Clifton Place Brooklyn NY; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Evan Newman

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Evan Newman; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Notice of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Notice of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) For MS #'s 1,2,3

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) For MS #'s 1,2,3; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Confirmation Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Confirmation Notice; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Signed OSC

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Signed OSC; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARNIE ZICHERMAN AKA CHARNY ZICHERMAN AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARNIE ZICHERMAN AKA CHARNY ZICHERMAN AOM; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 7106 FRESH POND LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 7106 FRESH POND LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 652 GRANDVIEW AVENUE LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 652 GRANDVIEW AVENUE LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 340 CLIFTON PLACE LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 340 CLIFTON PLACE LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 250 SCHAFER LLC AKA 250 SCHAEFER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 250 SCHAFER LLC AKA 250 SCHAEFER; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 118 KINGSLAND LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 118 KINGSLAND LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Partial Cancellation LP -340 Clifton Place Brooklyn NY; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Evan Newman; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Notice of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation of Partial Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Kittredge, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) For MS #'s 1,2,3; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Confirmation Notice; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Signed OSC; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Rosenfeld, A.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARNIE ZICHERMAN AKA CHARNY ZICHERMAN; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARNIE ZICHERMAN AKA CHARNY ZICHERMAN AOM; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 7106 FRESH POND LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 652 GRANDVIEW AVENUE LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 340 CLIFTON PLACE LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 250 SCHAFER LLC AKA 250 SCHAEFER; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 118 KINGSLAND LLC; Filed By: Newman, E. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Newman, E.; Filed: 01/02/2019; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less