This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/25/2020 at 18:05:41 (UTC).

GEICO A/S/O ALDEN G. KERR - v. - NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 GEICO A/S/O ALDEN G KERR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alden Kerr G

GEICO

Petitioners and Defendants

JAMMIE PEGUES W

NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT

Respondents

Aubrey J. Kerr

Alden G. Kerr

Not Yet Classified

Law Offices of Bryan M. Kulak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

KONUNCHUK, SUZANNE ELAINE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BRYAN M. KULAK (GEICO)

Petitioner Attorney

TODD COREY RUBENSTEIN

Defendant Attorney

RUBENSTEIN, TODD COREY

Attorney at Todd C. Rubenstein, Esq.

Respondent Attorney

TARA PARLMAN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Parlman, T.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

THIRD-PARTY ANSWER

THIRD-PARTY ANSWER; Filed By: Parlman, T.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JAMMIE W. PEGUES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JAMMIE W. PEGUES; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Aubrey J. Kerr

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Aubrey J. Kerr; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Alden G. Kerr

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Alden G. Kerr; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Parlman, T.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD-PARTY ANSWER; Filed By: Parlman, T.; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JAMMIE W. PEGUES; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Aubrey J. Kerr; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Third Party Service on Alden G. Kerr; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW ENGLAND MOTOR FREIGHT; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rubenstein, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Konunchuk, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less