This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:13:02 (UTC).

Gary Mighty - v. - Foodsaver New York, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Gary Mighty filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Foodsaver New York, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Mighty

Defendant

Foodsaver New York, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELL, JOSEPH GERARD

Attorney at DELL & DEAN, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

GRESIO, RICHARD EDWARD

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD E. GRESIO

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention with Affidavit of Service

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dell, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Dell, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer with Counter Claims

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer with Counter Claims; Filed By: Gresio, R.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2018; Received: 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer with Counter Claims; Filed By: Gresio, R.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dell, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Dell, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dell, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less