This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 21:08:57 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC v. PATRICIA FITCH

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICIA FITCH. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7181

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

Patricia Fitch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Groeger, S.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Groeger, S.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Groeger, S.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Groeger, S.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL MAILING (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less