Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:23:13 (UTC).

Freedom Mortgage Corporation - v. - Edward B. Smart et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Freedom Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Edward B Smart. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

John Doe (1-10) (said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein)

Mary Doe (1-10) (said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein)

Edward B. Smart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

VITTI, LOIS MARIE

Attorney at Vitti Law Group, Inc.

FAY, RICHARD PATRICK

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY entered by the clerk

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Exhibits A-B

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Exhibits A-B; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Exhibits A-B; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/29/2018; Received: 06/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/27/2018; Received: 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vitti, L.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less