This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 18:20:06 (UTC).

Franz Martin Frank as Executor of the Estate of Eva Klingelsmith - v. - Michael McClard

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 Franz Martin Frank as Executor of the Estate of Eva Klingelsmith filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Michael McClard. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Shlomo Hagler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Shlomo Hagler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franz Martin Frank as Executor of the Estate of Eva Klingelsmith

Defendant

Michael Mcclard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGLANDER, JACOB ARI

Attorney at Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

JUDGMENT

--none--

BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)

Bill of Costs with process server invoice annexed

EXHIBIT(S)

Interest Calculation through 3/12/19

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Default Judgment Submitted Pursuant to Justice Hagler's Rules of Motion Practice - Includes Interest Calculation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Amended Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Process Server Aileen Garay

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex D to Gabel Aff - Emails 2

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex C to Gabel Aff - Emails 1

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex B to Gabel Aff - Lease Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex A to Gabel Aff - Summons with Notice

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

Affirmation of Johannes K. Gabel

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex A to Proposed Ex Parte Order - Summons with Notice

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)

--none--

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

--none--

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Bill of Costs with process server invoice annexed; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Interest Calculation through 3/12/19; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Default Judgment Submitted Pursuant to Justice Hagler's Rules of Motion Practice - Includes Interest Calculation; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Amended Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Emails dated 10/5/17, 10/17/17, 12/19/17 & 1/10/17 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A to Garay Aff - Postal Confirmation; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Process Server Aileen Garay; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Ex D to Gabel Aff - Emails 2; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Ex C to Gabel Aff - Emails 1; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B to Gabel Aff - Lease Agreement; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A to Gabel Aff - Summons with Notice; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation of Johannes K. Gabel; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A to Proposed Ex Parte Order - Summons with Notice; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Englander, J.; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less