This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 01/05/2023 at 08:22:22 (UTC).

FRANK MARCHESE v. ERNST KNUDSEN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 FRANK MARCHESE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERNST KNUDSEN. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul Marrone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Paul Marrone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Marchese

Defendant

Ernst Knudsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIMON, LAWRENCE MICHAEL

YOUNGWORTH-WRIGHT, LOGAN

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS, JEFFREY WILLS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ciccotta, T.; Filed: 01/13/2022; Received: 01/13/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ciccotta, T.; Filed: 01/31/2022; Received: 01/31/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

ANSWER Answer & Combined Demands

ANSWER Answer & Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation in Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation in Good Faith; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Pleadings; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Combined Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

COURT NOTICE (Motion #001)

COURT NOTICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Youngworth-Wright, L.; Filed: 10/24/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Youngworth-Wright, L.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Youngworth-Wright, L.; Filed: 11/16/2022; Received: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Youngworth-Wright, L.; Filed: 10/24/2022; Received: 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Pleadings; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation in Good Faith; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Combined Demands; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Lewis, J.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ciccotta, T.; Filed: 01/31/2022; Received: 01/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ciccotta, T.; Filed: 01/13/2022; Received: 01/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less