This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 17:35:05 (UTC).

Frank Fiumefreddo et al - v. - 414-416 Jersey Street, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2017 Frank Fiumefreddo filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 414-416 Jersey Street, LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Gazzani JR

Frank Fiumefreddo

Anthony Gazanni

Defendants

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

City of New York Parking Violations Bureau

City of New York Environmental Control Board

Lucky Cai 519 Inc.

414-416 Jersey Street, LLC

Regiane Camara

NYC Transit Adjudication Bureau

John Doe 1-12

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZURICA, ANTHONY

Attorney at ZURICA LAW

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NOTICE RPAPL 1303 upon Occupants/tenants]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NOTICE RPAPL 1303 upon Occupants/tenants]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC TRANSIT]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC TRANSIT]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC ENVIRONMENTAL]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC ENVIRONMENTAL]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC PARKING]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC PARKING]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [LUCKY CAI 519 INC. VIA PERSONAL]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [LUCKY CAI 519 INC. VIA PERSONAL]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANTS JOHN DOE 1-12 414 Street VACANT]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANTS JOHN DOE 1-12 414 Street VACANT]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 6 JUANA SMITH]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 6 JUANA SMITH]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [Occupant John Doe 5 Delena Reyes]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [Occupant John Doe 5 Delena Reyes]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 4 EDWIN REYES]

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 4 EDWIN REYES]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Default letter

EXHIBIT(S) - D Default letter; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Note

EXHIBIT(S) - B Note; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NOTICE RPAPL 1303 upon Occupants/tenants]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC TRANSIT]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC ENVIRONMENTAL]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [NYC PARKING]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [LUCKY CAI 519 INC. VIA PERSONAL]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANTS JOHN DOE 1-12 414 Street VACANT]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 6 JUANA SMITH]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [Occupant John Doe 5 Delena Reyes]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS [OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 4 EDWIN REYES]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS[OCCUPANT JOHN DOE 3 TORRIE SMITH]; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Default letter; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Mortgage; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Note; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Zurica, A.; Filed: 06/24/2017; Received: 06/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less