Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 09:21:23 (UTC).

FRANCISCO CRUZ - v. - PARAMOUNT LEASEHOLD, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 FRANCISCO CRUZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PARAMOUNT LEASEHOLD, L P. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Cruz

Defendants

PARAMOUNT LEASEHOLD, L.P.

AVISON YOUNG

K&L MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANGSAM, ELISE H

Attorney at LANGSAM LAW LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SPARLING, JOHN E

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

DI BERARDINO, ELIO M

Attorney at CULLEN and DYKMAN LLP

FISCHLER, ROBERT H

Attorney at CARTAFALSA SLATTERY TURPIN & LENOFF

PEKNIC, MAUREEN E

Attorney at EUSTACE, PREZIOSO & YAPCHANYK

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

stip discontinuing action

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

stip adjourning conference to 2:30 p.m.

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Stip of Disc v.. Avison Young

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Defendant Paramount Leasehold, L.P.'s Answer with Cross-Claims and Various Discovery Demansd

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stip discontinuing action; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by Langsam Law LLP; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE stip adjourning conference to 2:30 p.m.; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Disc v.. Avison Young; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AOS; Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by Langsam Law LLP; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by Langsam Law LLP; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Fischler, R.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendant Paramount Leasehold, L.P.'s Answer with Cross-Claims and Various Discovery Demansd; Filed By: Fischler, R.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by Langsam Law LLP; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Langsam, E. - filed by Langsam Law LLP; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less