This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 02:22:49 (UTC).

FRANCESCA D'AMBROSIO v. SAFECO CONSTRUCTION CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 FRANCESCA D'AMBROSIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAFECO CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas P Aliotta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas P Aliotta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francesca D'ambrosio

Defendants

John F. Ingargiola

Maria Ingargiola

SAFECO CONSTRUCTION CORP.

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

VERIZON NEW YORK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRERO, ENRIQUE ONESIMO

Attorney at GUERRERO & ROSENGARTEN

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPIRO, ADAM PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of Karen L. Lawrence

ALAHVERDIAN, ERICK KRIKOR

Attorney at Alahverdian Van Leuvan, P.C.

FAMULARI, GIANNA M.

Attorney at New York City Law Department, Staten Island Tort Office

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

LEVITSKY, JESSE THOMAS

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

VILLEGAS, BRIDGETTE

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

REIMER, ALEXANDRA JOIE

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 2/4/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 2/4/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

DEMAND FOR: Final good faith letter to Verizon

DEMAND FOR: Final good faith letter to Verizon; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

DEMAND FOR: 7/18/19 Demand to all defendants

DEMAND FOR: 7/18/19 Demand to all defendants; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

DEMAND FOR: 6/18/19 Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: 6/18/19 Combined Demands; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO DEFENDANTS

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO DEFENDANTS; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitsky, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Levitsky, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 2/4/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Final good faith letter to Verizon; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Villegas, B.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 7/18/19 Demand to all defendants; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: 6/18/19 Combined Demands; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO DEFENDANTS; Filed By: Alahverdian, E.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands for Defendants-City; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitsky, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Levitsky, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Guerrero, E.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less