Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:01:42 (UTC).

Frances Olivero-Booker - v. - Marcelino F D'Souza MD et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Frances Olivero-Booker filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Marcelino F D'Souza MD. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frances Olivero-booker

Defendants

Kaleida Health d/b/a Millard Fillmore Suburban Hospital

Nikhil Patel MD

Marcelino F D'souza MD

Pankaj Singhal MD

Caroline D'souza MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE FAZIO, JOHN LOUIS

Attorney at VIOLA, CUMMINGS & LINDSAY, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ARCARA, MARK DAVID

Attorney at Roach, Brown, McCarthy & Gruber, P.C.

FARRELL, KATHLEEN M.

Attorney at Melick & Porter

DANIEU, JOHN PATRICK

Attorney at ROACH BROWN MCCARTHY & GRUBER, P.C.

WEIDNER, BRIAN JAMES

Attorney at THE TARANTINO LAW FIRM, LLP

LOSS, JOHN TIMOTHY

Attorney at CONNORS LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

SCHEDULING ORDER

COURT NOTICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Bills of Particular

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint and Answers

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Bills of Particular; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint and Answers; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Authorizations, Responses and Demands Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Weidner, B. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Weidner, B. - filed by The Tarantino Law Firm; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Loss, J.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Danieu, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: De Fazio, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less