This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:06:41 (UTC).

Fourth Garden Park LP - v. - Town of Riverhead et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Fourth Garden Park LP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Town of Riverhead. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fourth Garden Park LP

Defendants

Assessor of the Town of Riverhead

Town of Riverhead

Board of Assessment Review

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWNE, ERIKA C

Attorney at GOLDMAN ATTORNEYS PLLC

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER

ORDER - PRE-TRIAL JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Comptroller & School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Comptroller & School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT

INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE

NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Application for Review of Assessment

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Application for Review of Assessment; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment for 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment for 2017; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRE-TRIAL JOINT PRE-TRIAL ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Comptroller & School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment for 2017; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Application for Review of Assessment; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less