Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 16:41:15 (UTC).

Fortesa Qorrolli et al - v. - METROPOLITAN DENTAL ASSOCIATES, D.D.S - 225 BROADWAY, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 Fortesa Qorrolli filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against METROPOLITAN DENTAL ASSOCIATES, D D S - 225 BROADWAY, P C. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nexhmije Qorrolli

Fortesa Qorrolli

Defendants

Mario Orantes

Paul I Cohen

METROPOLITAN DENTAL ASSOCIATES, D.D.S., P.C.

METROPOLITAN DENTAL ASSOCIATES, D.D.S - 225 BROADWAY, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLZBERG, ZACHARY IAN

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP, PLLC

DAVE, ISHAN

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group

Defendant Attorney

WIMS, DAVID C

Attorney at Law Office of David Wims

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130

--none--

STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

Motion on Room 130

INTERROGATORIES

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

--none--

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

--none--

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Dave, I.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2018; Received: 12/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130 (Motion #001); Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE; Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion on Room 130; Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Wims, D.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less