Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:29:41 (UTC).

FORREST VREELAND Jr. - v. - AERCO INTERNATIONAL, INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 FORREST VREELAND Jr filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AERCO INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah Chimes. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah Chimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forrest Vreeland JR. and KAREN VREELAND

Defendants

ON MARINE SERVICES COMPANY,

RILEY POWER INC,

McLAUGHLIN INSULATION CO., INC

GRINNELL LLC

CRANE CO.,

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, trading as NAPA AUTO PARTS

SHERWIN WILLIAMS COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

THE FAIRBANKS COMPANY,

ITT LLC.,

VOLVO PENTA OF THE AMERICAS, INC

GOULD PUMPS LLC

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC

INDUSTRIAL INSULATION SALES, INC

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A ., Inc.,

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC.,

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DREKSLER, ADAM SEAN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

ROMANELLI, CHRIS

Attorney at WEITZ AND LUXENBERG, PC

Defendant Attorneys

CARDAMONE, DANIELLE M.

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

WHITCOMB, JAMES WATKINS

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

GERNANT, ERIC MICHAEL

Attorney at O'Brien & Gere Engineers, Inc.

MAIMONE, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at MAIMONE & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

BRIDGE, CHARLES CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

HUTTNER, BRUCE S.

Attorney at DONOHUE, SABO, VARLEY & HUTTNER LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

MARIN, RICHARD P

Attorney at MARIN GOODMAN, LLP

BROOKS, STEPHEN PHILIP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

BURGASSER, JESSICA JEAN

Attorney at Wilbraham, Lawler & Buba

MUNDO, ANDREW JOHN

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

VAN GELDER, SUSAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

MARKOWITZ, NICOLE GERBER

Attorney at Peckar & Abramson, P.C.

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Exec. SOD as to Treadwell Corp.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Exec. SOD as to Treadwell Corp.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS Buffalo Pumps

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOE Buffalo Pumps

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

SOD Buffalo Pumps

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance w/Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance

EXHIBIT(S)

Voluntary Petition

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Georgia-Pacific LLC's - Verified Answer with cross claims

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

Union Carbide Corporation's Admission of Service

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION

Amendment to caption form

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

Preliminary conference

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

--none--

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Exec. SOD as to Treadwell Corp.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOE Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) SOD Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 12/07/2018; Received: 12/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance w/Prejudice; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Voluntary Petition; Filed By: Gernant, E.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gernant, E.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL de: The Fairbanks Company; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
244 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FW - Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Georgia-Pacific LLC's - Verified Answer with cross claims; Filed By: Romick, K.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation's Admission of Service; Filed By: Yavitz, J.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION Amendment to caption form; Filed By: Romanelli, C.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Preliminary conference; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romanelli, C.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Romanelli, C.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Romanelli, C.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Romanelli, C.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less