This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 16:20:51 (UTC).

Florene M Fetterly et al v. David Leone et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Florene M Fetterly filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against David Leone. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0965

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patsy Leone

Florene M Fetterly

Lori ann Leone

Nancy A. Jacobs

Frank B. Leone JR

Defendants

David Leone

Ryan Rios

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDBAS, DAVID GURION

Attorney at DAVID G. GOLDBAS,ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

HOBAICA, PETER WILLIAM

Attorney at Peter M. Hobaica, LLC

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Attached Exhibits

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Attached Exhibits; Filed By: Hobaica, P.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Exhibits

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Exhibits; Filed By: Hobaica, P.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on David Leone

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on David Leone; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service re: Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Attached Exhibits; Filed By: Hobaica, P.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Complaint with Counterclaims and Exhibits; Filed By: Hobaica, P.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on David Leone; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goldbas, D.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less