This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 15:15:36 (UTC).

Floormaster of Glens Falls, Inc. et al v. Gospel Lighthouse Church et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Floormaster of Glens Falls, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gospel Lighthouse Church. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0338

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Washington, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Floormaster of Glens Falls, Inc.

d/b/a Floormaster Carpet One

Defendants

Gospel Lighthouse Church

Paul G Mead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDI, MICHAEL AUGUST

Attorney at FitzGerald Morris Baker Firth PC

Defendant Attorney

NIKAS, WILLIAM L.

Attorney at WILLIAM L NIKAS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Nikas, W.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Nikas, W.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Nikas, W.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Nikas, W.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandi, M.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less