This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 04/28/2020 at 23:26:45 (UTC).

Fizzy Bubbly Beverage LLC et al - v. - RMG Distributors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2018 Fizzy Bubbly Beverage LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RMG Distributors LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fizzy Bubbly Beverage LLC

Anthony Caruso

Defendants

RMG Distributors LLC

Stephen Garzone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GULLO, DOMINICK

Attorney at Cassandra & Gullo, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

HIGGS, CHARLES ANDREW

Attorney at Law Office of Charles A. Higgs

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001)

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected* Request Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected* Request Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Stephen Garzone

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Stephen Garzone; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RMG Distributors LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RMG Distributors LLC; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/30/2019; Received: 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Promissory Note and Agreement; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 01/07/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected* Request Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Stephen Garzone; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RMG Distributors LLC; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Higgs, C.; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Gullo, D.; Filed: 04/25/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less